There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Women Who Worked on the Home Front World War II Memorial Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Women Who Worked on the Home Front Foundation to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
03/11/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/11/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/11/2020Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
12/04/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
12/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/13/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1434-1435)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (23)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources11/13/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands12/02/2019 Referred to
12/04/2019 Hearings by
03/11/2020 Discharged from

As of 04/08/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5068 - Women Who Worked on the Home Front World War II Memorial Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.