There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Capturing All Small Businesses Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Capturing All Small Businesses Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Capturing All Small Businesses Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to adjust the employment size standard requirements for determining whether a manufacturing concern is a small business concern, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/08/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H37)
12/19/2019Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-360.
11/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
01/09/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
01/08/2020-3:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/08/2020-3:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H37)
01/08/2020-3:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5130.
01/08/2020-3:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H37-39)
01/08/2020-3:19pmHouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/19/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 285.
12/19/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-360.
11/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
11/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
11/15/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
11/15/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 11/15/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business11/15/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
12/19/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-360
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship01/09/2020 Referred to

As of 02/19/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5130 - Capturing All Small Businesses Act of 2019


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5130. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (01/08/2020)

Capturing All Small Businesses Act of 2019

This bill extends from 12 months to 24 months the time period to which an agency must refer when categorizing a manufacturer as a small business based on its average employment.