There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Stop Sexual Assault and Harassment in Transportation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Stop Sexual Assault and Harassment in Transportation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Sexual Assault and Harassment in Transportation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect transportation personnel and passengers from sexual assault and harassment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
10/01/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/29/2020Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
07/29/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-463, Part I.
11/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/19/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
10/01/2020-4:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2020-4:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5183-5186)
10/01/2020-3:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5139.
10/01/2020-3:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5183-5188)
10/01/2020-3:47pmHouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/29/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 371.
07/29/2020HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
07/29/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-463, Part I.
12/18/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/20/2019HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
11/20/2019HouseSubcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
11/20/2019HouseSubcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
11/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/20/2019HouseSubcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged.
11/19/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/19/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/19/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/19/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/18/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/18/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
07/29/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-463
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation11/19/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation11/19/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials11/19/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit11/19/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary11/18/2019 Referred to
07/29/2020 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security12/18/2019 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/19/2020 Referred to

As of 10/23/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5139 - Stop Sexual Assault and Harassment in Transportation Act


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5139. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House, Part I (07/29/2020)

Stop Sexual Assault and Harassment in Transportation Act

This bill establishes formal sexual assault and harassment policies for the transportation industry.

Among other things, the bill

  • requires certain passenger transportation carriers, including passenger airlines and vessels, buses, commuter and intercity passenger railroads, and transportation network companies (e.g., Uber or Lyft) to establish formal policies, training, and reporting structures regarding sexual assault and harassment;
  • sets forth civil penalties for individuals who physically assault or sexually assault-or threaten to assault transportation personnel;
  • directs the Department of Transportation to collect information on the number of sexual assault and harassment incidents reported by the carriers and make such information publicly available; and
  • expands the reporting process for individuals involved in transportation sexual assault or harassment incidents by allowing such individuals to report allegations to law enforcement in a manner that protects their privacy and confidentiality.