There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Indian Buffalo Management Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Indian Buffalo Management Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To assist Tribal governments in the management of buffalo and buffalo habitat and for the reestablishment of buffalo on Indian lands.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-670.
11/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
12/18/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 554.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/18/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-670.
09/30/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
02/05/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States
12/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 11/18/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/18/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 01/28/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/12/2020
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/26/2020
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources11/18/2019 Referred to
09/30/2020 Markup by
12/18/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-670
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States12/04/2019 Referred to
02/05/2020 Hearings by
09/30/2020 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5153.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (12/18/2020)

Indian Buffalo Management Act

This bill establishes a permanent program within the Department of the Interior to develop and promote tribal ownership and management of buffalo and buffalo habitat on Indian lands.

Specifically, the bill requires Interior to (1) enter into contracts, award grants, and provide technical assistance to Indian tribes and tribal organizations for activities related to buffalo restoration or management; (2) consult with tribes and tribal organizations on initiatives that affect buffalo or buffalo habitat, including efforts to contain or eradicate diseased buffalo; and (3) develop a policy relating to buffalo and buffalo habitat management activities on Indian land.

Additionally, Interior may enter into agreements with tribes or tribal organizations to transport surplus buffalo from federal land onto Indian land.