There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Tribal Wildlife Corridors Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Tribal Wildlife Corridors Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Interior to establish Tribal Wildlife Corridors, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/09/2020Committee on Agriculture discharged.
10/09/2020Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-559, Part I.
11/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
10/09/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/09/2020Committee on Agriculture discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/09/2020Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-559, Part I.
01/29/2020Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
01/29/2020Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
01/29/2020Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/29/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
12/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/19/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 11/19/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 11/19/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 08/25/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources11/19/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Markup by
10/09/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-559
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife12/06/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States12/06/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Discharged from
House Agriculture11/19/2019 Referred to
10/09/2020 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry12/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5179. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House, Part I (10/09/2020)

Tribal Wildlife Corridors Act of 2019

This bill authorizes the use of wildlife corridors on Indian land to provide habitat or ecological connectivity and allow for fish, wildlife, or plant movement on such land.

Specifically, the bill permits an Indian tribe to nominate a corridor within the land of such tribe as a tribal wildlife corridor. The Department of the Interior must establish criteria for determining whether such a corridor qualifies as a tribal wildlife corridor, including criteria for restoring historical habitat.

Interior must provide tribes with technical assistance to establish, manage, or expand a tribal wildlife corridor. Such assistance must include support with accessing wildlife data and working with private landowners to access programs for facilitating connectivity on nonfederal land.

Additionally, Interior must (1) establish a program to award grants to tribes to increase connectivity through tribal wildlife corridors, and (2) consult with tribes to determine whether a tribal wildlife corridor may be expanded into public lands or otherwise benefit connectivity between public lands and such corridor.

The bill also permits the Department of Agriculture to give priority under certain conservation programs to those projects that enhance connectivity by expanding a tribal wildlife corridor.