There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Housing is Infrastructure Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Housing is Infrastructure Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To facilitate the development of affordable housing, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/24/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-686.
11/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
12/24/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 569.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/24/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-686.
02/28/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 25.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/28/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/27/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/20/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/07/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/07/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/07/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/07/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/07/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/07/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 02/07/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/07/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/07/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/28/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/28/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 02/28/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/28/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/28/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 02/28/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/28/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/28/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/28/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/28/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/28/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/28/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/28/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/28/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 02/28/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 02/28/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/28/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/28/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/28/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 02/28/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/28/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/28/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/28/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/28/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 02/28/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/28/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/28/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/15/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/15/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/15/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/15/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/15/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/15/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/15/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/15/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/15/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/15/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/15/2020
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services11/20/2019 Referred to
02/28/2020 Markup by
12/24/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-686

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5187. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (12/24/2020)

Housing is Infrastructure Act of 2020

This bill authorizes additional funding for various housing assistance programs.

Specifically, the bill authorizes additional funding for

  • public housing agencies to maintain and improve public housing buildings;
  • states and communities to reduce the risk of flood damage to housing;
  • very low-income residents to improve and modernize rural housing;
  • Indian tribes to develop housing and housing services;
  • nonprofit organizations and community development financial institutions to conduct activities related to affordable housing and economic development;
  • state housing finance agencies to provide supportive housing for individuals with disabilities;
  • private nonprofit organizations to provide supportive housing for the elderly; and
  • states, counties, and cities to develop and preserve affordable housing.

The bill also requires that specified portions of funding made available under the bill be used for water and energy efficiency.

In administering such funding made available under the bill, the relevant federal agencies must consult with grantees and recipients and meet with state and local government officials for the purpose of recommending and promoting funding opportunities and initiatives to include minority and women's business enterprises in such grant activities.