There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Telemental Health Expansion Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Telemental Health Expansion Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide coverage under the Medicare program of certain mental health telehealth services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/24/2020Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
12/24/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-697, Part I.
11/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
12/24/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/24/2020Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/24/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-697, Part I.
07/15/2020Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
07/15/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/15/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/30/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/21/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/15/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/20/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce11/20/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
12/24/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-697
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/21/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Discharged from
House Ways and Means11/20/2019 Referred to
12/24/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5201. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House, Part I (12/24/2020)

Telemental Health Expansion Act of 2020

This bill permanently excludes mental health services that are furnished via telehealth from certain originating site requirements under Medicare. Under current law, these telehealth services are excluded from such requirements through the end of the public health emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).