There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Refugee Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the admission and protection of refugees, asylum seekers, and other vulnerable individuals, to provide for the processing of refugees and asylum seekers in the Western Hemisphere, and to modify certain special immigrant visa programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
12/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/21/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 11/21/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/21/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 11/21/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/22/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/22/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/22/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/26/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 11/26/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/11/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/15/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/21/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/28/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/20/2020

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/21/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship12/19/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means11/21/2019 Referred to
House Budget11/21/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs11/21/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (70)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.