There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Closing the Homework Gap Through Mobile Hotspots Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Telecommunications and Information Administration Organization Act to establish a mobile hotspot grant program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
11/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/21/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1485)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 11/21/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/26/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/26/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/26/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/26/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/04/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 12/04/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/05/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/12/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/08/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/09/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/13/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/27/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/04/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 02/13/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 03/11/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/19/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/25/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/08/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/08/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/21/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology11/22/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor11/21/2019 Referred to

As of 08/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5243 - Closing the Homework Gap Through Mobile Hotspots Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5243. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/21/2019)

Closing the Homework Gap Through Mobile Hotspots Act

This bill requires the National Telecommunications and Information Administration (NTIA) to establish the Mobile Hotspot Grant Program.

Under the program, the NTIA may provide grants to eligible institutions (e.g., elementary and secondary schools, universities, Indian Tribes, or libraries) to facilitate a mobile hotspot program that provides students with a portable hotspot device for connecting to the internet. The NTIA shall prioritize institutions that will provide hotspots to the highest number of low-income students and, to the extent practicable, shall disburse at least 5% of grant funds to Indian Tribes and 5% to U.S. territories and the District of Columbia.