There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

MORE TOD Act
Maximizing Our Redevelopment and Efficiency for Transit Oriented Development Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend MAP-21 to provide that certain station projects are eligible for funds under the program for transit-oriented development planning, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/22/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/22/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 11/22/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/10/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 12/17/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/08/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/22/2019 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Highways and Transit11/25/2019 Referred to

As of 01/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5255 - MORE TOD Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.