There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Cambodia Democracy Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Cambodia Democracy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote free and fair elections, political freedoms, and human rights in Cambodia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5802-5803)
01/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/15/2019-4:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/15/2019-4:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5802-5803)
07/15/2019-4:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 526.
07/15/2019-4:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5802-5805)
07/15/2019-4:25pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/09/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/09/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
04/09/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/11/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary01/11/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship02/25/2019 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations07/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.526. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/15/2019)

Cambodia Democracy Act of 2019

This bill directs the President to impose sanctions on individuals responsible for acts to undermine democracy in Cambodia, including acts that constituted serious human rights violations.

The sanctions shall be directed at senior Cambodian government, military, or security forces officials responsible for such actions, as well as entities controlled or owned by such individuals.

The sanctions shall include blocking assets and restricting the entry of sanctioned individuals into the United States, and shall not apply to the importation of goods.

The President may waive the sanctions with respect to a person or entity if it is in the national interest of the United States. The President may suspend the sanctions if Cambodia makes meaningful progress toward ending government efforts to undermine democracy or committing human rights violations.