There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

International Violence Against Women Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent international violence against women, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (133)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 11/26/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 11/26/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 11/26/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 11/26/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/03/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/03/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/04/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/04/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/05/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 12/11/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/12/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/24/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/26/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations12/06/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (60)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.