There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing America's Ports Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to develop a plan to increase to 100 percent the rates of scanning of commercial and passenger vehicles entering the United States at land ports of entry along the border using large-scale non-intrusive inspection systems to enhance border security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
12/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 12/17/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 01/24/2020
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/24/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security11/26/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations12/13/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability12/13/2019 Referred to

As of 01/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5273 - Securing America's Ports Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.