There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Fair Student Loan Debt Collection Practices Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act to prohibit debt collectors from collecting on certain Federal student loan debt when the borrower would not be required to make payments under an income-driven repayment plan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
12/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/11/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 24.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/11/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/10/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services12/03/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary12/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law12/19/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor12/03/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5287.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5287. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/03/2019)

Fair Student Loan Debt Collection Practices Act

This bill prohibits a debt collector from collecting on federal student loan debt owed by a borrower earning under a certain income. Specifically, a federal student loan debt collector may not attempt to collect if a borrower would qualify for a zero-dollar payment under an income-driven repayment plan. Additionally, a debt collector may not attempt to collect an amount greater than the payment the borrower would owe under such a plan.