There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CONTRACT Act of 2019
Continuity for Operators with Necessary Training Required for ATC Contract Towers Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for a full annuity supplement for certain air traffic controllers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/04/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/06/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 12/06/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 12/09/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/09/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 12/10/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/13/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 12/16/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 12/17/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/18/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/18/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 12/19/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 01/07/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 01/07/2020
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 01/07/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/08/2020
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 01/08/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/08/2020
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 01/09/2020
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 01/13/2020
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 01/13/2020
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/14/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/15/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/17/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/17/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/17/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/17/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 01/17/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/24/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/24/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/24/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/24/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 01/24/2020
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/27/2020
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/27/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 01/29/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/29/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 01/29/2020
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/29/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/30/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/30/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/2020
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 02/04/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/05/2020
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 02/05/2020
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/05/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/06/2020
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/07/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 02/07/2020
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/12/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 02/12/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/14/2020
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/21/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/21/2020
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 02/26/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/27/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 05/19/2020
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/19/2020
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/27/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/28/2020
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 06/04/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/08/2020
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 06/22/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/26/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/29/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/2020
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/06/2020
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 07/20/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform12/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5297. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/04/2019)

Continuity for Operators with Necessary Training Required for ATC Contract Towers Act of 2019 or the CONTRACT Act of 2019

This bill exempts certain air traffic controllers from a required reduction in their retirement annuity payment on account of earnings from certain work performed while entitled to such annuity.

Under current law, retired Federal Aviation Administration air traffic controllers receive an annuity payment during the period between the mandatory retirement age of 56 and the social security minimum age of 62. Such annuity payment is required to be reduced by a certain percentage of any excess earnings during this period.

The bill exempts from such reduction in annuity payments an air traffic controller who participates in the Air Traffic Control Contract Program (a public-private partnership for air traffic control services) following mandatory retirement.