There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

AIM HIGH Act
Accessible Instructional Materials in Higher Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the creation of a commission to develop voluntary accessibility guidelines for electronic instructional materials and related technologies used in postsecondary education, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/05/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/10/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 01/10/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 01/28/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2020
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/13/2020
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/13/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/13/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 02/13/2020
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/13/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/13/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 02/21/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/21/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/21/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/21/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/21/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/21/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/21/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/21/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 02/21/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/25/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/25/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2020
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 02/28/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/02/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/04/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 03/04/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/04/2020
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/09/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 03/09/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/09/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/12/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/08/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/27/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/01/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 06/26/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/26/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor12/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5312. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/05/2019)

Accessible Instructional Materials in Higher Education Act or the AIM HIGH Act

This bill creates a commission to develop voluntary guidelines for postsecondary electronic instruction materials and related technologies.

Specifically, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the President pro tempore of the Senate, and the Secretary of Education must establish an independent commission to (1) develop and issue voluntary accessibility guidelines for postsecondary electronic instructional materials and related technologies, (2) develop a model framework for pilot testing such materials and technologies, and (3) produce an annotated list of information technology standards.

The Department of Education must review and, as appropriate, update the voluntary guidelines, pilot testing framework, and information technology standards every five years.