There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Alternatives to Detention Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to use alternatives to detention for certain vulnerable immigrant populations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 01/23/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/04/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/05/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/05/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/08/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/14/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/26/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 02/28/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/06/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/06/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/08/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/08/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/08/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/08/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/08/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/08/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/08/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/08/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/29/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/29/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/29/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/01/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/04/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/04/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/09/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 09/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/14/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship02/25/2019 Referred to

As of 12/07/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.532 - Alternatives to Detention Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.532. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/14/2019)

Alternatives to Detention Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish programs for providing alternatives to detaining individuals under the immigration laws, including community-based supervision and community support programs. DHS may not detain and must place in an alternative detention program individuals deemed members of a vulnerable population (e.g., asylum seekers, pregnant or nursing women, or crime victims), a parent of a child under age 18, or a caregiver.

DHS shall not use alternative detention programs for (1) aliens subject to mandatory detention, or (2) aliens where release on bond or recognizance is deemed to be sufficient.

DHS shall establish the position of Coordinator of Alternatives to Detention and Family Reunification to coordinate the use of alternative detention programs and to reunify parents with children separated from them. Executive departments shall cooperate with the coordinator to the greatest extent practicable to facilitate the performance of the coordinator's mission.