There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Your Credit Score Act of 2020

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Your Credit Score Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Your Credit Score Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to ensure that consumer reporting agencies are providing fair and accurate information reporting in consumer reports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 179 (Roll no. 126).
03/12/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-416.
12/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/29/2020-6:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/29/2020-6:39pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 179 (Roll no. 126). (text: 06/26/2020 CR H2559-2561)
06/29/2020-6:01pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 184 - 228 (Roll no. 125).
06/29/2020-5:19pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2665-2667)
06/29/2020-3:53pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Riggleman demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further consideration on the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
06/29/2020-3:53pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
06/29/2020-3:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Riggleman motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike section 3 from the bill and insert a new section prohibiting the use of social security numbers.
06/29/2020-3:48pmHouseMr. Riggleman moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H2663)
06/29/2020-3:47pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2663-2664)
06/26/2020-4:14pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 5332 were postponed.
06/26/2020-4:14pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/26/2020-3:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5332.
06/26/2020-3:19pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
06/26/2020-3:19pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1017. (consideration: CR H2559-2571)
06/24/2020-7:02pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1017 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
03/12/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 335.
03/12/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-416.
12/11/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 24.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/11/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/10/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/06/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
12/06/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 12/06/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services12/06/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
03/12/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-416

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5332. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (03/12/2020)

Protecting Your Credit Score Act of 2019

This bill revises provisions related to consumer credit reports and credit reporting agencies.

Credit reporting agencies are directed to create a central online portal that allows consumers to (1) access free credit reports and credit scores, (2) dispute errors, and (3) place or lift security freezes.

Consumers will receive a free credit score when requesting a free annual credit report.

The bill establishes a public registry for credit reporting agencies. The bill also provides the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) with statutory authority for supervising credit reporting agencies.

A credit reporting ombudsperson is established at the CFPB, whose responsibilities include resolving persistent errors by credit reporting agencies.

A court may award injunctive relief to compel a credit reporting agency to comply with credit report protections.

Credit reporting agencies must provide available information to consumers regarding the purpose behind the procurement of a credit report.

The bill gives the CFPB the authority to establish data security requirements for credit reporting agencies.

The Government Accountability Office must report on the feasibility of credit reporting agencies replacing Social Security numbers as identifiers with another type of federal identification.