There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hazel M. Johnson Memorial Stamp Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the issuance of a commemorative postage stamp in honor of Hazel M. Johnson, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/27/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 02/12/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/21/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/13/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform12/06/2019 Referred to

As of 08/12/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5343 - Hazel M. Johnson Memorial Stamp Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5343. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/06/2019)

Hazel M. Johnson Memorial Stamp Act

This bill requires the U.S. Postal Service to issue a commemorative postage stamp in honor of Hazel M. Johnson, who was known as the mother of the environmental justice movement.