There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Diversify Act
Diversifying by Investing in Educators and Students to Improve Outcomes For Youth Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To remove college cost as a barrier to every student having access to a well-prepared and diverse educator workforce, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1552)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/08/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/08/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/08/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/08/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 01/08/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/08/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/08/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/28/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/28/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/28/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/28/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/28/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 01/28/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/28/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 01/28/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/28/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/10/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 02/10/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 02/10/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/28/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor12/06/2019 Referred to
House Budget12/06/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5350. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/06/2019)

Diversifying by Investing in Educators and Students to Improve Outcomes For Youth Act or the Diversify Act

This bill increases the maximum grant award under the Teacher Education Assistance for College and Higher Education (TEACH) Grant Program. The TEACH program awards grants to college students who plan to teach in low-income areas.

The bill also exempts the TEACH program from sequestration, which is a process of automatic, usually across-the-board spending reductions under which budgetary resources are permanently cancelled to enforce specific budget policy goals.