There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

New Way Forward Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reform the process for enforcing the immigration laws of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
01/30/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/10/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1571-1572)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 12/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 12/10/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 12/10/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/08/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/08/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/08/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/08/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 01/08/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/28/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/28/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 01/28/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/28/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/10/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary12/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship01/30/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5383.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5383. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/10/2019)

New Way Forward Act

This bill makes changes to immigration enforcement, including ending mandatory detention in certain cases.

The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall not enter into or extend any contract with any public or private for-profit entity to own or operate a facility to detain aliens in DHS custody.

The bill provides for various protections related to detaining aliens, such as (1) requiring DHS to make an initial custody determination and establish probable cause within 48 hours of taking an alien into custody, (2) establishing in hearings related to such determinations a presumption that the alien be released, and (3) requiring immigration judges to impose the least restrictive detention conditions necessary.

A DHS officer may not interrogate a person as to immigration status based on factors such as the person's race, religion, sexual orientation, or spoken language.

The bill removes mandatory detention requirements for certain aliens, such as asylum seekers with a credible fear of persecution.

Removal proceedings against certain aliens previously admitted into the United States must commence within five years of the alien becoming deportable or inadmissible. The bill also removes certain crime-related grounds of inadmissibility and deportability.

The bill gives immigration judges discretion to provide relief from removal if the removal is not based on certain crime-related grounds.

State or local officers are prohibited from performing certain immigration enforcement functions, such as apprehending aliens. The National Crime Information Center database shall not contain an alien's immigration information.

The bill repeals provisions providing criminal penalties for improper entry or reentry into the United States.