There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 770 Ayrault Road in Fairport, New York, as the "Louise and Bob Slaughter Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/21/2019Became Public Law No: 116-42. (TXT | PDF)
08/21/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019Presented to President.
07/30/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5204)
05/15/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
04/02/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 7 (Roll no. 142).(text: CR H2969)
01/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
08/21/2019Became Public Law No: 116-42. (TXT | PDF)
08/21/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019HousePresented to President.
07/31/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/30/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204)
05/15/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 87.
05/15/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
05/15/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/03/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
04/02/2019-4:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/02/2019-4:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 7 (Roll no. 142). (text: CR H2969)
04/02/2019-4:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2972)
04/02/2019-3:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/02/2019-3:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 540.
04/02/2019-3:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2969-2970)
04/02/2019-3:33pmHouseMr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/26/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
03/26/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
01/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
01/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 01/14/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/14/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/15/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/15/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/15/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/15/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/15/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/15/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/15/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/15/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/15/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/15/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/15/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 01/15/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/18/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 01/18/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/18/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/18/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/18/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/18/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/18/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/18/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/22/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/22/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/22/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/24/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/24/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/24/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 01/24/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/24/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/24/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/29/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/29/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/29/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/29/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/29/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/05/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/05/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/08/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/08/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/11/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/19/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 03/18/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/01/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 04/01/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform01/14/2019 Referred to
03/26/2019 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/03/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Markup by
05/15/2019 Reported by

As of 02/29/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.540 - To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 770 Ayrault Road in Fairport, New York, as the "Louise and Bob Slaughter Post Office".


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.540. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-42 (08/21/2019)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 770 Ayrault Road in Fairport, New York, as the "Louise and Bob Slaughter Post Office."