There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish the National Urban Security Technology Laboratory, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/10/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 3 (Roll no. 242).(text: CR H4364)
05/28/2019Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-87.
01/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
06/11/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/10/2019-6:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/10/2019-6:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 3 (Roll no. 242). (text: CR H4364)
06/10/2019-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4375-4376)
06/10/2019-3:22pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/10/2019-3:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 542.
06/10/2019-3:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4364-4365)
06/10/2019-3:16pmHouseMiss Rice (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/28/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 62.
05/28/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-87.
05/15/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/15/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/15/2019HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Discharged.
02/04/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
01/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
01/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/14/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security01/14/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Markup by
05/28/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-87
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation02/04/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/11/2019 Referred to

As of 07/16/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.542 - Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.542. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/14/2019)

Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act

This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security to designate the National Urban Security Technology Laboratory, previously known as the Environmental Measurements Laboratory.

The laboratory shall (1) conduct tests, evaluations, and assessments of current and emerging technologies for emergency response providers, including cybersecurity of such technologies that can connect to the Internet; (2) conduct research and development on radiological and nuclear response and recovery; and (3) act as a technical advisor to emergency response providers.