Committees: H.R.5430 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/13/2019 Referred to
12/17/2019 Markup by
12/19/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-358
House Education and Labor12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Natural Resources12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Budget12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation12/14/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation12/14/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management12/14/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit12/14/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials12/14/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment12/14/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Agriculture12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce12/16/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform12/13/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Discharged from
Senate Appropriations01/03/2020 Referred to
01/15/2020 Markup by
01/15/2020 Reported by
Senate Budget01/03/2020 Referred to
01/14/2020 Markup by
01/15/2020 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/03/2020 Referred to
01/15/2020 Markup by
01/15/2020 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works01/03/2020 Referred to
01/14/2020 Markup by
01/15/2020 Reported by
Senate Finance01/03/2020 Referred to
01/07/2020 Markup by
01/15/2020 Reported by
Senate Foreign Relations01/03/2020 Referred to
01/15/2020 Markup by
01/15/2020 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/03/2020 Referred to
01/15/2020 Markup by
01/15/2020 Reported by