There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Sandy Duplication of Benefits Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide a duplication of benefits fix for Sandy CDBG-DR recipients, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
12/18/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 12/17/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 12/17/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 12/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/17/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management12/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5452. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/17/2019)

Sandy Duplication of Benefits Fairness Act

This bill expands the applicability of the waiver of the prohibition against duplication of benefits for disaster relief recipients following Superstorm Sandy. Under current law, the waiver period extends from January 1, 2016, through December 31, 2021. This bill begins that period on October 1, 2012, through December 31, 2021. This change would permit individuals who suffered losses resulting from Superstorm Sandy and who initially applied for and received federal benefits, including Small Business Administration disaster relief loans, to receive additional federal benefits, including funds under the Department of Housing and Urban Development Block Grant for Disaster Relief (CDBG-DR), without having to repay such additional benefits.