There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Jimmy Carter National Historical Park Redesignation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Jimmy Carter National Historical Park Redesignation Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Jimmy Carter National Historical Park Redesignation Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Jimmy Carter National Historical Park Redesignation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Jimmy Carter National Historical Park Redesignation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate the Jimmy Carter National Historic Site as the "Jimmy Carter National Historical Park".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-341.
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021Presented to President.
12/21/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
12/14/2020Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-643.
12/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-341.
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021HousePresented to President.
12/21/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7902)
12/18/2020SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/17/2020-2:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/17/2020-2:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7249-7250)
12/17/2020-2:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5472.
12/17/2020-2:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7249-7251)
12/17/2020-2:52pmHouseMr. Gallego moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/14/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 528.
12/14/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-643.
09/30/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
07/13/2020HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
01/08/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
12/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources12/18/2019 Referred to
09/30/2020 Markup by
12/14/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-643
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands01/08/2020 Referred to
07/13/2020 Hearings by
09/30/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5472. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/18/2019)

Jimmy Carter National Historical Park Redesignation Act

This bill redesignates the Jimmy Carter National Historic Site in Georgia as the Jimmy Carter National Historical Park.