There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Venezuela TPS Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Venezuela TPS Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Venezuela TPS Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate Venezuela under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to permit nationals of Venezuela to be eligible for temporary protected status under such section, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 272 - 158 (Roll no. 514).(text: CR H7409)
07/23/2019Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 268 - 154 (Roll no. 498).
07/23/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-168.
01/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/25/2019-6:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2019-6:00pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 272 - 158 (Roll no. 514). (text: CR H7409)
07/25/2019-5:46pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 215 - 217 (Roll no. 513).
07/25/2019-5:38pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
07/25/2019-5:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Reschenthaler motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to insert new language on Page 1, line 11: "because of the economic, humanitarian, security and refugee crisis that is a direct result of years of socialist policies implemented by the regimes of Hugo Chavez and Nicolas Maduro".
07/25/2019-5:29pmHouseMr. Reschenthaler moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H7440-7441)
07/25/2019-5:28pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7440-7443)
07/25/2019-3:38pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 549.
07/25/2019-3:37pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/25/2019-3:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 30 minutes of debate on H.R. 549.
07/25/2019-3:15pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549 under closed rules. Resolution also waives clause 6(a) of Rule XIII, requiring a two-thirds vote waiver to consider a rule on the same day it is reported from the Rules Committee against any resolution reported through the legislative day of July 26, 2019.
07/25/2019-3:15pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 519. (consideration: CR H7409-7412)
07/25/2019-1:46pmHouseRule H. Res. 519 passed House.
07/24/2019-9:38pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 519 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549 under closed rules. Resolution also waives clause 6(a) of Rule XIII, requiring a two-thirds vote waiver to consider a rule on the same day it is reported from the Rules Committee against any resolution reported through the legislative day of July 26, 2019.
07/23/2019-7:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 268 - 154 (Roll no. 498).
07/23/2019-7:06pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7222-7223)
07/23/2019-6:14pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/23/2019-5:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 549.
07/23/2019-5:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7211-7215; text: CR H7211)
07/23/2019-5:36pmHouseMs. Mucarsel-Powell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/23/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 128.
07/23/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-168.
05/22/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 9.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/22/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/15/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/15/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (33)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/15/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
07/23/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-168
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship02/25/2019 Referred to
Senate Judiciary07/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.549. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/25/2019)

Venezuela TPS Act of 2019

This bill addresses the migration of Venezuelan nationals by permitting them to qualify for temporary protected status, which prevents their removal from the United States and allows them to obtain employment and travel authorization.