There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Military Selective Service Act, and thereby terminate the registration requirements of such Act and eliminate civilian local boards, civilian appeal boards, and similar local agencies of the Selective Service System.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
12/19/2019Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/19/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/19/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/07/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/09/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/16/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/05/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/05/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services12/19/2019 Referred to

As of 02/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5492 - To repeal the Military Selective Service Act, and thereby terminate the registration requirements of such Act and eliminate civilian local boards, civilian appeal boards, and similar local agencies of the Selective Service System.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5492. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/19/2019)

This bill repeals the requirement for males between the ages of 18 and 26 to register with the Selective Service.

The bill provides that an individual shall not be penalized for prior failure to register with the Selective Service.