There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for extended months of Medicare coverage of immunosuppressive drugs for kidney transplant patients, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
07/15/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/15/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/11/2020Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/11/2020Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
01/08/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
12/24/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/23/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/23/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 12/23/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 12/23/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 12/23/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 12/23/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 12/23/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/07/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/07/2020
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/13/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/13/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/15/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 01/15/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 01/15/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/24/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 01/29/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/29/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/29/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/04/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/04/2020
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/05/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/10/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/10/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/10/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 02/13/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/18/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 02/25/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/25/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/25/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/25/2020
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2020
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/25/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/26/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/26/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 02/27/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/27/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/27/2020
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/27/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 02/27/2020
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 02/27/2020
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 02/28/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 03/02/2020
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 03/02/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/02/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 03/02/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/02/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/02/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/03/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 03/09/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/13/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/13/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/23/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 03/23/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/14/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/14/2020
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/14/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/30/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/30/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/30/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/30/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 07/16/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/16/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/16/2020
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 07/31/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/31/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 07/31/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/31/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/31/2020
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 08/07/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/23/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/24/2019 Referred to
01/08/2020 Hearings by
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/11/2020 Reported by
House Ways and Means12/23/2019 Referred to

As of 08/14/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5534 - Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5534. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/23/2019)

Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2019

This bill indefinitely extends Medicare coverage of immunosuppressive drugs for kidney transplant recipients for individuals who do not have other coverage. Under current law, Medicare coverage is limited to 36 months following a transplant.