There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To regulate monitoring of electronic communications between an incarcerated person in a Bureau of Prisons facility and that person's attorney or other legal representative, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/16/2020Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-507.
01/07/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/22/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/21/2020-2:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2020-2:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4577)
09/21/2020-2:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5546.
09/21/2020-2:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4576-4579)
09/21/2020-2:04pmHouseMs. Scanlon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/16/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 407.
09/16/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-507.
02/12/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/12/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/11/2020HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
01/28/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/07/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/07/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/07/2020 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
09/16/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-507
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/28/2020 Referred to
02/11/2020 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary09/22/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5546. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (09/16/2020)

Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act

This bill prohibits the Department of Justice from monitoring the contents of a privileged electronic communication between an incarcerated person and his or her legal representative.