There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Access to Counsel Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Access to Counsel Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify the rights of all persons who are held or detained at a port of entry or at any detention facility overseen by U.S. Customs and Border Protection or U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/05/2020Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
03/05/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-412, Part I.
01/10/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
03/05/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2020Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-412, Part I.
02/12/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/12/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/11/2020Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged.
01/28/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/17/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
01/10/2020Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/10/2020Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/10/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/10/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/10/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/15/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/15/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/17/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 01/27/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/27/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/30/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/30/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/30/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/30/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/03/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/04/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/05/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/05/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/05/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/05/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/07/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 02/10/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/11/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/13/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 02/13/2020
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/13/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/13/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/13/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 02/13/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 02/13/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/18/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/18/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/10/2020 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
03/05/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-412
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship01/28/2020 Referred to
02/11/2020 Discharged from
House Homeland Security01/10/2020 Referred to
03/05/2020 Discharged from
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations01/17/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5581. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House, Part I (03/05/2020)

Access to Counsel Act of 2020

This bill provides various protections for covered individuals subject to secondary or deferred inspections when seeking admission into the United States. Covered individuals include U.S. nationals, lawful permanent residents, aliens in possession of a visa, and refugees.

The Department of Homeland Security shall ensure that a covered individual subject to secondary or deferred inspection has a meaningful opportunity to consult with counsel and certain related parties, such as a relative, within an hour of the start of the secondary inspection and as necessary during the inspection process. The counsel and related party shall be allowed to advocate on behalf of the covered individual, including by providing evidence and information to the examining immigration officer.

A lawful permanent resident subject to secondary or deferred inspection may not abandon lawful permanent resident status until the individual has had a reasonable opportunity to seek advice from counsel, unless the individual voluntarily and knowingly waives in writing this opportunity to seek counsel's advice.