There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Haiti Development, Accountability, and Institutional Transparency Initiative Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Haiti Development, Accountability, and Institutional Transparency Initiative Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To measure the progress of recovery and efforts to address corruption, rule of law, and media freedoms in Haiti.

Official Title as Introduced

To measure the progress of recovery and development efforts in Haiti and the strength of democracy and rule of law in the country.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/18/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5897-5898)
01/13/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/18/2020-1:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2020-1:58pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2020-1:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5897-5898)
11/18/2020-1:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5586.
11/18/2020-1:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5897-5900)
11/18/2020-1:48pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/29/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/29/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/04/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere, Civilian Security and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/13/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/13/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/13/2020 Referred to
07/29/2020 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere, Civilian Security and Trade02/04/2020 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations11/30/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5586.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5586. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (11/18/2020)

Haiti Development, Accountability, and Institutional Transparency Initiative Act

This bill directs the Department of State to undertake specific initiatives to prioritize and assess (1) the protection and preservation of human rights in Haiti, (2) the promotion of press and assembly freedoms and the protection of journalists in Haiti, (3) efforts to combat corruption in Haiti, and (4) a strategy of post-disaster recovery and development efforts in Haiti.