There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Boundary Waters Wilderness Protection and Pollution Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the protection of the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness and interconnected Federal lands and waters, including Voyageurs National Park, within the Rainy River Watershed in the State of Minnesota, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/14/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
02/05/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
01/17/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/17/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/14/2020Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/14/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 01/14/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/14/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/14/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3]* 01/14/2020
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/14/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 01/17/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/17/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/17/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/17/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/17/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/21/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/21/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/24/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/24/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/24/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/24/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/27/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 01/27/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 01/28/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/28/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4] 01/30/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/30/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/30/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 01/30/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/30/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/30/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/04/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/04/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/04/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/10/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 02/10/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/10/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/14/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/14/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/25/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/26/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/28/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/02/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/02/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/25/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/25/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/07/2020
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/21/2020 01/28/2020 H635

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/14/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources01/17/2020 Referred to
02/05/2020 Hearings by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands01/17/2020 Referred to

As of 08/13/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5598 - Boundary Waters Wilderness Protection and Pollution Prevention Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5598. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/14/2020)

Boundary Waters Wilderness Protection and Pollution Prevention Act

This bill withdraws approximately 234,328 acres of federal land and waters in a specified area in the Rainy River Watershed of Superior National Forest in Minnesota from

  • entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws;
  • location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and
  • operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws.

The area is adjacent to the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness and the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness Mining Protection Area. Land or interest in land within such area that is acquired by the United States shall be immediately withdrawn in accordance with this bill.

The Forest Service is authorized to permit the removal of sand, granite, iron ore, and taconite from national forest system lands within such area if the removal is not detrimental to the water quality, air quality, and health of forest habitat within the Rainy River Watershed.