There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

AMIGOS Act
Advancing Mutual Interests and Growing Our Success Act

Short Titles as Introduced

AMIGOS Act
Advancing Mutual Interests and Growing Our Success Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To include Portugal in the list of foreign states whose nationals are eligible for admission into the United States as E1 and E2 nonimmigrants if United States nationals are treated similarly by the Government of Portugal.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/03/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9189)
01/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/04/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/03/2019-4:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/03/2019-4:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9189)
12/03/2019-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 565.
12/03/2019-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9189-9191)
12/03/2019-3:54pmHouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/23/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/23/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/22/2019HouseSubcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged.
02/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/15/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/15/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/15/2019 Referred to
10/23/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship02/25/2019 Referred to
10/22/2019 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary12/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.565. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/03/2019)

Advancing Mutual Interests and Growing Our Success Act or the AMIGOS Act

This bill makes Portuguese nationals eligible for E-1 and E-2 nonimmigrant visas if the government of Portugal provides similar nonimmigrant status to U.S. nationals.

An E-1 visa is for individuals entering the United States to engage in international trade, while an E-2 visa is for individuals investing a substantial amount of capital in the United States. Both are limited to nationals from countries that have a treaty of commerce and navigation with the United States.