There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

LIFT Act
Leveraging Information on Foreign Traffickers Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

LIFT Act
Leveraging Information on Foreign Traffickers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Trafficking Victims Protection Act of 2000 to ensure adequate time for the preparation of the annual Trafficking in Persons Report, require the timely provision of information to the Office to Monitor and Combat Trafficking in Persons and the Bureau of Diplomatic Security of the Department of State regarding the number and location of visa denials based, in whole or in part, on grounds related to human trafficking, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/22/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 197).
01/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/23/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/22/2020-4:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2020-4:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 197). (text: CR H4674-4675)
09/22/2020-3:52pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4688)
09/22/2020-1:40pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/22/2020-1:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5664.
09/22/2020-1:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4674-4677)
09/22/2020-1:23pmHouseMr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/04/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/04/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/07/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/21/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/21/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/21/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/21/2020 Referred to
03/04/2020 Markup by
House Judiciary01/21/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security02/07/2020 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations09/23/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5664. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/22/2020)

Leveraging Information on Foreign Traffickers Act or the LIFT Act

This bill requires the Department of State to ensure that the Office to Monitor and Combat Trafficking in Persons and the Bureau of Diplomatic Security receive timely and regular information regarding visa denials based on grounds related to human trafficking. The bill also extends (1) to June 30 the deadline for submission of the annual Trafficking in Persons Report, and (2) through FY2025 the survivor-led Advisory Council on Human Trafficking.