There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Merchant Mariners of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Merchant Mariners of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Merchant Mariners of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Merchant Mariners of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the United States Merchant Mariners of World War II, in recognition of their dedicated and vital service during World War II.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/13/2020Became Public Law No: 116-125. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2020Signed by President.
03/09/2020Presented to President.
03/02/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/02/2020Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/27/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H547-548)
01/24/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/13/2020Became Public Law No: 116-125. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2020Signed by President.
03/09/2020HousePresented to President.
03/03/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/02/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1269)
03/02/2020SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/28/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
01/27/2020-5:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/27/2020-5:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H547-548)
01/27/2020-5:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5671.
01/27/2020-5:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H547-549)
01/27/2020-5:32pmHouseMr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/24/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
01/24/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/27/2020
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/27/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services01/24/2020 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/28/2020 Referred to
03/02/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5671. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-125 (03/13/2020)

Merchant Mariners of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2020

This bill provides for a Congressional Gold Medal to be awarded to the U.S. Merchant Mariners of World War II, in recognition of their service during World War II.

Following the award of the medal, it shall be given to the American Merchant Marine Museum, where it shall be available for display and research.