There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1 League in Irvine, California, as the "Tuskegee Airman Lieutenant Colonel Robert J. Friend Memorial Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/29/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/29/2020Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/10/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/10/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/10/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/10/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/10/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/10/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/10/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/10/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/10/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/10/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/10/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 02/12/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/12/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/12/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 02/12/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/12/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/12/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/12/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/12/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/12/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/12/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 02/12/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/12/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/21/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/21/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/21/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/21/2020
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/21/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/21/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/21/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/21/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/21/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/21/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/21/2020
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 02/25/2020
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/25/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/25/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 02/25/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/25/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/02/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 03/02/2020
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/10/2020
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/10/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/10/2020
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/11/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 03/11/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 09/14/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/14/2020
Rep. Garcia, Mike [R-CA-25] 10/09/2020
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 10/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform01/29/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5711.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5711. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2020)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1 League in Irvine, California, as the "Tuskegee Airman Lieutenant Colonel Robert J. Friend Memorial Post Office Building."