There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Transnational White Supremacist Extremism Review Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Transnational White Supremacist Extremism Review Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Under Secretary for Intelligence and Analysis of the Department of Homeland Security to develop and disseminate a threat assessment regarding threats to the United States associated with foreign violent white supremacist extremist organizations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
01/30/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/01/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/30/2020-1:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2020-1:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5077)
09/30/2020-1:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5736.
09/30/2020-1:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5077-5078)
09/30/2020-1:10pmHouseMs. Underwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/12/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/12/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/12/2020HouseSubcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism Discharged.
02/05/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
01/30/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
01/30/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/29/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security01/30/2020 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism02/05/2020 Referred to
02/12/2020 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/01/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5736.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5736. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/30/2020)

Transnational White Supremacist Extremism Review Act

This bill directs the Office of Intelligence and Analysis of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to develop and disseminate a threat assessment and reference aid regarding threats to the United States associated with foreign violent white supremacist extremist organizations.

The threat assessment and reference aid (1) shall be developed in coordination with DHS's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties and other appropriate agencies and may be informed by existing products developed by such office and agencies; and (2) shall include an overview of symbols, flags, or other references utilized by adherents of foreign violent white supremacist extremist organizations.

The office shall share the threat assessment and reference aid with (1) state, local, and tribal law enforcement officials; and (2) owners and operators of online platforms to assist in identifying content that may be associated with a foreign violent white supremacist extremist organization that may violate the terms of service of such platforms, upon request from such platforms. Such office shall ensure that the threat assessment and reference aid does not contain the name or other identifiable information of any individual or organization engaged in lawful political or public discourse in the United States protected under the Constitution.