There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Seniors Have Eyes, Ears, and Teeth Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand Medicare coverage to include eyeglasses, hearing aids, and dental care.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H551-552)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 01/15/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/15/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/15/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/15/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/15/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/15/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/15/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/25/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/25/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/18/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/19/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/27/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/04/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/04/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/15/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/15/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/01/2019 Referred to

As of 10/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.576 - Seniors Have Eyes, Ears, and Teeth Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.576. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/15/2019)

Seniors Have Eyes, Ears, and Teeth Act

This bill expands Medicare coverage to include eyeglasses, hearing aids, and dental care.