There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans HOPE Act
Veterans Heroin Overdose Prevention Examination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to conduct a review on opioid overdose deaths among veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/02/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/06/2020Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/25/2020
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 03/02/2020
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/01/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/06/2020 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/02/2020 Referred to

As of 08/13/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5774 - Veterans HOPE Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5774. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2020)

Veterans Heroin Overdose Prevention Examination Act or the Veterans HOPE Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to complete a review of the deaths of all covered veterans who died from opioid overdoses during the five-year period preceding the enactment of this bill. Covered veterans are those who received VA hospital care or medical services during the five-year period preceding the death of the veteran.

The VA shall report on the results of the review and make such report publicly available.