There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cooling-Off Period Elimination Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that any State or local law enforcement agency that has in effect a cooling-off period is ineligible to receive Federal funds pursuant to a Department of Justice law enforcement grant program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/06/2020Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/07/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/04/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/11/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/11/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/11/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/11/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/11/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/11/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/15/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/15/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/09/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/06/2020 Referred to

As of 08/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5778 - Cooling-Off Period Elimination Act of 2020


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5778. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2020)

Cooling-Off Period Elimination Act of 2020

This bill makes a state or local law enforcement agency ineligible to receive federal funds under a Department of Justice law enforcement grant program if it has in effect a cooling-off period. A cooling-off period is a period of time following an officer-involved shooting during which investigators are prohibited from communicating with an officer involved in the shooting.