There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Grand Jury Reform Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that in the case of a law enforcement officer who uses deadly force against a person, and thereby causes the death of that person, a hearing shall be conducted before a judge to determine whether there is probable cause for the State to bring criminal charges against the law enforcement officer relating to the death of the person, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/06/2020Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/04/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/11/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/11/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/11/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/11/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/11/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/11/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/11/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/15/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/09/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/06/2020 Referred to

As of 08/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5779 - Grand Jury Reform Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5779. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2020)

Grand Jury Reform Act of 2020

This bill conditions a state or local government's receipt of funds under the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant program on the state's compliance with certain requirements following an incident involving the use of deadly force by a local law enforcement officer that results in a person's death.

Specifically, the governor must appoint a special prosecutor to present evidence before a judge to determine whether probable cause exists to criminally charge the law enforcement officer. The hearing must be open to the public.