There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

State and Local Cybersecurity Improvement Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

State and Local Cybersecurity Improvement Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

State and Local Cybersecurity Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program to make grants to States to address cybersecurity risks and cybersecurity threats to information systems of State, local, Tribal, or territorial governments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/18/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-478.
02/10/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/01/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/30/2020-1:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2020-1:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5080-5083)
09/30/2020-1:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5823.
09/30/2020-1:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5080-5084)
09/30/2020-1:30pmHouseMs. Underwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/18/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384.
08/18/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-478.
02/12/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/12/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/10/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
02/10/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security02/10/2020 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
08/18/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-478
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/01/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.