There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Consumer Protections Against Surprise Medical Bills Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974, the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, and title XI of the Social Security Act to prevent certain cases of out-of-network surprise medical bills, strengthen health care consumer protections, and improve health care information transparency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/10/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
02/12/2020Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/12/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/11/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/10/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/10/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/10/2020
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 02/10/2020
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 02/12/2020
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 02/12/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/12/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/12/2020
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 02/14/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/14/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 02/25/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 03/03/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 11/05/2020

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/10/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/10/2020 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/10/2020 Referred to
House Education and Labor02/10/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/10/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation02/11/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5826. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/10/2020)

Consumer Protections Against Surprise Medical Bills Act of 2020

This bill makes a series of changes related to health care costs and billing practices. Among other things, the bill

  • applies the in-network cost-sharing amount to certain emergency and related nonemergency services that are provided out-of-network,
  • applies the in-network cost-sharing amount to nonemergency services that are provided out-of-network at an in-network facility unless specified written notice requirements are met,
  • establishes procedures for health insurance plans to negotiate reimbursement amounts paid to out-of-network providers in states without such a process,
  • requires insurance plans to establish publicly available databases that list the contact information for in-network providers and facilities,
  • requires health care providers and insurance plans to provide certain cost estimates for services scheduled at least three days in advance,
  • requires plans to continue benefits for specified long-term care when an insurance plan's contractual relationship with a provider or facility changes or terminates,
  • requires insurance plans to include specified consumer assistance and benefits information on a plan holder's membership card and maintain certain price comparison tools for in-network services,
  • establishes reporting requirements related to air ambulance services,
  • establishes a temporary income tax deduction for specified expenses resulting from out-of-network and emergency services.