There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Oversight for Veterans Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide the Inspector General of the Department of Veterans Affairs testimonial subpoena authority, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
09/17/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/17/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/10/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
03/02/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/11/2020Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/09/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/11/2020 Referred to
09/17/2020 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations03/02/2020 Referred to
03/10/2020 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.