There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Break Free From Plastic Pollution Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Solid Waste Disposal Act to reduce the production and use of certain single-use plastic products and packaging, to improve the responsibility of producers in the design, collection, reuse, recycling, and disposal of their consumer products and packaging, to prevent pollution from consumer products and packaging from entering into animal and human food chains and waterways, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
02/12/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/11/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/11/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/12/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/12/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 02/12/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/12/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/13/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/21/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 02/21/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/21/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/21/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/21/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/21/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/21/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/25/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 02/26/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/26/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/27/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/28/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 03/02/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/02/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 03/02/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/02/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 03/02/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 03/04/2020
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 03/04/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/05/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/05/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/11/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/11/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/11/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/12/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 03/13/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/17/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/17/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/22/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/11/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/22/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/13/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/13/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/13/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/20/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/24/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/29/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/29/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/30/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/30/2020

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/11/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/11/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/11/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/12/2020 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/11/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (56)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5845. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2020)

Break Free From Plastic Pollution Act of 2020

This bill sets forth requirements related to waste and recycling collection systems for a variety of products and materials, including plastics.

The bill makes certain producers of products (e.g., packaging, paper, single-use products, beverage containers, or food service products) fiscally responsible for collecting, managing, and recycling or composting the products after consumer use. In addition, the bill establishes (1) minimum percentages of products that must be reused, recycled, or composted; and (2) an increasing percentage of recycled content that must be contained in beverage containers.

Beginning on January 1, 2022, the bill phases out a variety of single-use products, such as plastic utensils. The bill also sets forth provisions to encourage the reduction of single-use products, including by establishing programs to refund consumers for returning beverage containers and by establishing a tax on carryout bags.

The bill creates a temporary moratorium on new or expanded permits for facilities that manufacture plastics until regulations are updated to address pollution from the facilities.

The Environmental Protection Agency must publish guidelines for a national standardized labeling system for recycling and composting receptacles. Producers must include labels on their products that are easy to read and indicate whether the products are recyclable, compostable, or reusable.

Finally, the bill establishes limitations on the export of plastic waste to other countries.