There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fix the Immigration Loopholes Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To close loopholes in the immigration laws that serve as incentives to aliens to attempt to enter the United States unlawfully, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/16/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/04/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 04/18/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 04/18/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/18/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 04/18/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 04/29/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/29/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 04/30/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/30/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 04/30/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/01/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/01/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 05/02/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/02/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/03/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/03/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 05/03/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 05/03/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/03/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/03/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 05/03/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/03/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/07/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/07/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/07/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 05/09/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 05/09/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 05/10/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/10/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 05/14/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 05/14/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/16/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/17/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/17/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/20/2019
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 05/21/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 05/23/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/03/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 06/03/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 06/05/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/05/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/10/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/27/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 07/05/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 07/09/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 07/17/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/17/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/23/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/24/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 08/02/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/16/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/28/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/18/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 02/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/16/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship02/25/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs01/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.586. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/16/2019)

Fix the Immigration Loopholes Act

This bill modifies immigration law provisions relating to unaccompanied alien minors and to asylum seekers.

For certain unaccompanied inadmissible alien children, generally those not at risk of being trafficking victims nor having a fear of persecution, the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall repatriate the child. Currently, only inadmissible unaccompanied aliens from neighboring countries are subject to repatriation, and DHS has discretion whether to repatriate.

When HHS releases an unaccompanied child to an individual, it shall provide DHS with certain information about that individual, including Social Security number and immigration status.

The bill amends the definition of "credible fear of persecution" to require that such fear can be established by statements that are more probable than not. The bill also imposes certain rules relating to credible fear interviews, including requirements for recordings and interpreters.

If an alien is granted asylum because of fear of persecution in a country, the alien is deemed to have renounced asylum status by returning to that country, if there has been no change in the country's conditions. DHS may waive such renunciation if there was a compelling reason for the return.

The bill expands the definition of a frivolous asylum application to include an application so insufficient in substance that it is clear that it was filed to delay removal or seek employment authorization.

Any individual who knowingly and willfully makes materially false statements or uses fraudulent documents in asylum-related proceedings shall be fined or imprisoned up to 10 years, or both.