There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

RELIEF Act
Restoring the Efforts of Local Involvement in Emergencies and Floods Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Act of August 18, 1941 (commonly known as the Flood Control Act of 1941), to allow a non-Federal sponsor to carry out certain work, to provide for reimbursement of costs to complete such work, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/12/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/13/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/12/2020Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/12/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/25/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/12/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/13/2020 Referred to

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5868 - RELIEF Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.