There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Modernization Centers of Excellence Program Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program to facilitate the adoption of modern technology by executive agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
12/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-194. (TXT | PDF)
12/03/2020Signed by President.
11/24/2020Presented to President.
11/17/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7044)
09/30/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
02/13/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-194. (TXT | PDF)
12/03/2020Signed by President.
11/24/2020HousePresented to President.
11/18/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/17/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7044)
10/01/2020SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/30/2020-12:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2020-12:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5072)
09/30/2020-12:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5901.
09/30/2020-12:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5072-5073)
09/30/2020-12:35pmHouseMr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
09/16/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
02/13/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
02/13/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/13/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/01/2020
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform02/13/2020 Referred to
09/16/2020 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5901. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-194 (12/03/2020)

Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program Act

This bill requires the General Services Administration (GSA) to establish an Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program to facilitate the adoption of modern technology by executive agencies.

The GSA shall (1) coordinate with the Department of Homeland Security in establishing the program to ensure that the technology, tools, and frameworks facilitated for executive agencies by the program provide sufficient cybersecurity and maintain the integrity, confidentiality, and availability of federal information; and (2) report to Congress.