Text: H.R.5911 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2020)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 5911 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 5911

 To provide for the liquidation or reliquidation of certain entries of 
products of European Union member states exported on or before October 
           9, 2019, and entered on or after October 18, 2019.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           February 13, 2020

 Mr. Pascrell introduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
                      Committee on Ways and Means

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
 To provide for the liquidation or reliquidation of certain entries of 
products of European Union member states exported on or before October 
           9, 2019, and entered on or after October 18, 2019.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act maybe cited as the ``For Accurate Import Relief To Aid 
Retailers and Importers of Foreign Freights Act of 2019'' or ``FAIR 
TARIFF Act of 2019''.

SEC. 2. CERTAIN ENTRIES OF PRODUCTS OF EUROPEAN UNION MEMBER STATES 
              ENTERED AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2019.

    (a) In General.--Notwithstanding sections 514 and 520 of the Tariff 
Act of 1930 (19 U.S.C. 1514 and 1520), or any other provision of law, 
U.S. Customs and Border Protection shall--
            (1) liquidate or reliquidate each entry of a product--
                    (A) provided for in subheading 9903.89.05, 
                9903.89.10, 9903.89.13, 9903.89.16, 9903.89.19, 
                9903.89.22, 9903.89.25, 9903.89.28, 9903.89.31, 
                9903.89.34, 9903.89.37, 9903.89.40, 9903.89.43, 
                9903.89.46, or 9903.89.49 of the HTS; and
                    (B) that--
                            (i) was exported to the United States on or 
                        before October 9, 2019; and
                            (ii) was entered, or withdrawn from 
                        warehouse for consumption, during the 120-day 
                        period beginning on October 18, 2019; and
            (2) refund to the importer of record the amount of 
        additional duties previously collected on the entry of that 
        product by reason of the application of that subheading of the 
        HTS to the product.
    (b) Request.--
            (1) In general.--Liquidation or reliquidation may be made 
        under subsection (a) with respect to an entry described in 
        subsection (a) only if a request is filed with the U.S. Customs 
        and Border Protection not later than 90 days after the date of 
        the enactment of this Act.
            (2) Clarification.--The filing of an entry described in 
        subsection (a) may serve as the filing of a request described 
        in paragraph (1) with respect to the entry.
    (c) Refund of Amounts Owed.--
            (1) Unliquidated entries.--For an entry described in 
        subsection (a) that is unliquidated, any duties, including 
        interest, eligible for a refund under subsection (a) shall be 
        processed for purposes of liquidation in accordance with 
        sections 504 and 505 of the Tariff Act of 1930 (19 U.S.C. 1504 
        and 1505).
            (2) Reliquidated entries.--Any amounts owed by the United 
        States pursuant to a reliquidation of an entry described in 
        subsection (a) (including interest from the date of entry) 
        shall be refunded not later than 90 days after the date on 
        which the request for reliquidation is filed under subsection 
        (b).
    (d) HTS Defined.--In this section, the term ``HTS'' means the 
Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States.
                                 <all>

Share This Section